HI HB2633 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the University of Hawaii college of tropical agriculture and human resources to conduct a study and inventory of heritage breed animals that existed in the State prior to 1778. Appropriates funds.
Title
Heritage Breed Animals; Study; University of Hawaii; Appropriation
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-01-31 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-01-31 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-04-14 2:01PM in conference room 309. |
2014-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-04-14 2:20PM in House conference room 309. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2633&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB2633_.HTM |