HI HB2633 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-10 - (S) Referred to CPN.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-10 - (S) Referred to CPN.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the continuing education requirement for real estate licensees from ten hours to twenty hours in a two-year period.
Title
Real Estate Brokers and Salespersons; Continuing Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | (S) Referred to CPN. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 13). | |
2010-02-09 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Magaoay, Sagum excused (3). | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 191-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-03 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Herkes, Wakai, Belatti, Cabanilla, Ito, Karamatsu, Luke, McKelvey, Morita, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Carroll, Mizuno. | |
2010-01-29 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-03-10 2:00pm in House conference room 325. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Referred to CPC, referral sheet 7 | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |