HI HB2629 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation to award funds no later than an unspecified number of days after the deadline to file a consolidated application or no later than an unspecified number of days after the filing of a duly submitted consolidated application if no deadline has been established by the corporation. Takes effect on 7/1/2025. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Hawaii Housing Finance And Development Corporation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
2020-02-13HouseReported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 401-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-02-04HouseThe committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Aquino, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-01-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-04-20 9:15AM in House conference room 423.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB3105 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to HOU, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback