HI HB2629 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation to award funds no later than an unspecified number of days after the deadline to file a consolidated application or no later than an unspecified number of days after the filing of a duly submitted consolidated application if no deadline has been established by the corporation. Takes effect on 7/1/2025. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Hawaii Housing Finance And Development Corporation.
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] |
Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2). |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 401-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-04 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Aquino, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-04-20 9:15AM in House conference room 423. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3105 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to HOU, WAM.