HI HB2628 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Judiciary, in consultation with other stakeholders, to submit monthly and annual reports to the Legislature on the effectiveness of agreements for post-booking jail diversion programs in the first circuit. Amends the criminal justice diversion program to enable examination of defendants via telehealth. Provides a mechanism for the automatic screening of certain nonviolent defendants for involuntary hospitalization or assisted community treatment. Authorizes courts to require certain probation violators to undergo a mental health evaluation and treatment program as a condition of continued probation.
Title
Relating To Rehabilitation.
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Terez Amato [D] | Rep. Cory Chun [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] |
Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. May Mizuno [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Mahina Poepoe [D] |
Rep. Adrian Tam [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-07-24 11:15AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-24 11:15 AM, House conference room 329. |
2024-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-02-24 9:45AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to HLT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Assisted Community Treatment
Criminal Justice Diversion Program
Involuntary Hospitalization
Mental Health Treatment
Post-Booking Jail Diversion Programs
Probation Violators
Telehealth
Criminal Justice Diversion Program
Involuntary Hospitalization
Mental Health Treatment
Post-Booking Jail Diversion Programs
Probation Violators
Telehealth
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2628&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2628_.HTM |