HI HB2628 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs to conduct a comprehensive review of relevant state laws to develop legislation to establish a state-operated bank of the State of Hawaii. Appropriates funds to conduct the review. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To A Bank Of The State Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Kobayashi [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Intrastate Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Intrastate Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 263). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 955-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-20 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-13 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2). |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 421-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-10 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-10-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2). |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 219-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2020-02-04 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 02-04-20 9:30AM in House conference room 430. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |