HI HB2623 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-31 - The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the early childhood education scholarship program within the University of Hawaii to assist students with school tuition in return for a service commitment to teach in a preschool classroom of the executive office on early learning public prekindergarten program. Appropriates funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Early Childhood Education Scholarships.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-31HouseThe committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2020-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Friday, 01-31-20 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
2020-01-29HouseRe-referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 8
2020-01-27HouseReferred to LHE/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback