HI HB2621 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to EGH, JDL.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Government Operations and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to EGH, JDL.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Government Operations and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the Procurement Policy Board's mandate to adopt rules regarding lost, stolen, damaged, unserviceable, or unsuitable property to include time limits for reporting issues and a duty for government agencies and contractors to cooperate in the investigation of raised issues. Effective July 1, 2112. (HB2621 HD2)
Title
Government Accountability; Procurement Policy Board; Government Contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to EGH, JDL. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 379). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 779-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-25 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Kawakami, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima. |
2014-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-25-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Cachola, Takai excused (3). |
2014-02-10 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 267-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2014-02-05 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Har, Yamane. |
2014-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-05-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-14. |
2014-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-03-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 7 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |