HI HB2613 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 117, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1218).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 117, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1218).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for fiscal year 2018-2019 to maintain the initial staff position and operations necessary to develop and manage Heeia National Estuarine Research Reserve and its programs. (HB2613 CD1)
Title
Making An Appropriation For Heeia National Estuarine Research Reserve.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Act 117, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1218). |
2018-07-10 | Senate | Act 117, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1218). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 120-18). |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 120-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, K. Rhoads, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Keohokalole, Gates, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-25 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-26-18 4:10PM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 827). |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Kahele Chair; K. Rhoads, Galuteria Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ing, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; Gates, Tupola. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 755) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3650) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-18 10:50AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from HRE/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3196) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Inouye, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kim, S. Chang, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-18 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to HRE/WTL, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 244). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Yamane excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1023-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-18 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 371-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-09 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, DeCoite, Creagan, Gates, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2018-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Friday, 02-09-18 10:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |