HI HB2607 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Act 051, 06/21/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1151).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Act 051, 06/21/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1151).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Education to develop and implement a statewide computer science curricula plan for public school students in K-12 that may include design thinking as part of the curricula and ensure each public high school offers at least 1 computer science course each school year. Authorizes the Department of Education to contract for computer science teacher development programs. Appropriates funds. (HB2607 CD1)
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Woodson [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-22 | Senate | Act 051, 06/21/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1151). |
2018-06-21 | House | Act 051, on 06/21/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1151). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 108-18). |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 108-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero. |
2018-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, McKelvey, Todd, Ohno, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Evans. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-18 2:45PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 793). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Galuteria Co-Chair; Espero. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, McKelvey, Evans, Todd Co-Chairs; Ohno, Matsumoto. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 753) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3651) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Shimabukuro. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-19-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2942) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Espero, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Dela Cruz. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-18 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 116). |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 853-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-18 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 685-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-14 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-14-18 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Souki excused (3). |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported from EDN/HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 90-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDB. |
2018-01-31 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Creagan, Kong, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Quinlan, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ing. |
2018-01-31 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kong, Creagan, Hashem, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Quinlan, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, McKelvey. |
2018-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN/HED on Wednesday, 01-31-18 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to EDN/HED, EDB, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2507 (Same As) 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).