HI HB2605 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Disallows dividends paid deduction for real estate investment trusts. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2020. Sunsets 12/31/2023. Takes effect on 7/1/2112. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Taxation Of Real Estate Investment Trusts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-07 - House - House Economic Development & Business: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
2020-02-14HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 604-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-02-07HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto.
2020-02-05HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-07-20 9:30AM in conference room 309.
2020-02-05HouseThe committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-20.
2020-02-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-05-20 9:35AM in House conference room 309.
2020-01-30HouseRe-referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 9
2020-01-27HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB2697 (Same As) 2020-06-25 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto, Quinlan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Matayoshi excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback