HI HB2604 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 232, 07/11/2016, (Gov. Msg. No. 1341).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 232, 07/11/2016, (Gov. Msg. No. 1341).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that acceptance by the Territorial Legislature or the Legislature of a dedication of land in the Kakaako Community Development District by a private owner is sufficient to convey title to the State. (HB2604 CD1)
Title
Public Lands; Acquisition of Real Property
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-12 | Senate | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 232, 07/11/2016, (Gov. Msg. No. 1341). |
2016-07-12 | House | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 232, 07/11/2016, (Gov. Msg. No. 1341). |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Jordan, Say voting no (2) and none excused (0). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 64-16). |
2016-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05/03/16. |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 64-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Keith-Agaran, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Rhoads, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2016-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 1:00PM in conference room 224. |
2016-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-16 1:00PM in conference room 224. |
2016-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-22-16 1:00PM in conference room 224. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 652). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Nishimoto, Pouha. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Galuteria, Slom. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 626) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3467) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Gabbard, Kim, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K.Kahele, L. Thielen. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 03-31-16 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Reported from WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3000) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, L. Thielen, Wakai, Slom. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-16-16 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to WLA, JDL. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 157). |
2016-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Jordan, Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 789-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-01 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima. |
2016-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-01-16 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2016-02-26 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-01-16 2:05PM in room 325. |
2016-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-26-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3). |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 439-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-02-05 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Say; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-05-16 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |