HI HB2603 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the department of education to establish a pilot program that provides grants for high school students enrolled in a career and technical education or career academy program to enroll in college courses through the running start program or other similar programs that allow students to earn college credits that are applicable to the requirements for a career discipline of high need, including teaching and renewable energy and related industries. Appropriates funds for the pilot program. Expands the eligibility criteria for the Hawaii Educator Loan Program to include students who have graduated from a career academy; provided that the loan recipient agrees to teach for three years at a public school in the State. Appropriates funds into and out of the Hawaii educator loan program revolving fund. Requires reports to legislature. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-26SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2020-06-26SenateReported from EDU/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3673) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2020-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran.
2020-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kanuha.
2020-03-10SenateThe committee(s) on EDU/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-20 2:55PM in conference room 229.
2020-03-03SenateReferred to EDU/HRE, WAM.
2020-02-28SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-02-28SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 103).
2020-02-27HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-27HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 776-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott.
2020-02-19HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
2020-02-13HouseReported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 430-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-02-04HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Quinlan, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno.
2020-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 02-04-20 2:30PM in House conference room 309.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback