HI HB2603 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Re-Referred to GVO/CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Re-Referred to GVO/CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a special fund to provide the State with self-insurance against the State's property and casualty risks. Appropriates moneys. (HB2603 HD1)
Title
Relating To State Self-insurance Against Property And Casualty Risks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO/CPH, WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 240). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 972-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Nakamura; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-15 | House | Re-referred to IAC, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2018-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 208-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Cachola, Fukumoto, Ito, LoPresti, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 02-06-18 10:30AM in House conference room 429. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3046 (Same As) 2018-02-13 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.