HI HB260 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Ganaden, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Quinlan, Tokioka, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Kapela, Okimoto voting no (3) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the counties to reclassify lands fifty acres or seventy-five acres in certain rural, urban, and agricultural districts; provided that a certain percentage of the housing units on the land sought to be reclassified are set aside for persons and families with incomes at or below one hundred forty percent of the area median income. Establishes penalties for violations related to land use commission district boundary amendments. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Housing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-09 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-12HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Ganaden, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Quinlan, Tokioka, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Kapela, Okimoto voting no (3) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
2021-02-12HouseReported from HSG/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 236) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-09HouseThe committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2021-02-09HouseThe committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) DeCoite; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2021-02-04HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSG/WAL on Tuesday, 02-09-21 8:30AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to HSG/WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-21HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback