HI HB2598 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Act 207, 7/2/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1317).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Act 207, 7/2/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1317).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Renames the Hawaii 3R's School Repair and Maintenance Fund the Hawaii 3R's School Improvement Fund. Requires the transfer of moneys collected pursuant to section 235-102.5(b), Hawaii Revised Statutes, and authorizes the transfer of any other moneys received in the form of grants and donations for school-level improvements and minor repairs and maintenance to the Hawaii 3R's School Improvement Fund. (HB2598 CD1)
Title
Hawaii 3R's; School Repair and Maintenance
Sponsors
Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | Senate | Act 207, 7/2/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1317). |
2014-07-08 | House | Act 207, on 7/2/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1317). |
2014-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751). |
2014-04-30 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720). |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-29 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Ito excused (3). |
2014-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 71-14). |
2014-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-29-14. |
2014-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 71-14) as amended in (CD 1). |
2014-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-16 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-21-14 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-15 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-16-14 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673). |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ohno, Woodson Co-Chairs; Fale Member. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Kidani Co-Chair; Slom Member. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 662) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3269) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi, Ruderman. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-14 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2845) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Gabbard, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-14 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 378). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 848-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Ward. |
2014-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-25-14 11:00AM in conference room 308. |
2014-02-21 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-14 at 11:00AM. |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-14 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll excused (2). |
2014-02-11 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 303-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-02-05 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Choy, Ichiyama, Matsumoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Awana, Hanohano, Say, Takai. |
2014-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-05-14 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB2425 (Same As) 2014-03-06 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 28