HI HB2596 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the broadband service infrastructure grant program to award grants to applicants to extend deployment of facilities used to provide broadband service to unserved and underserved areas of the State. Takes effect on 7/1/2112. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Broadband Service Infrastructure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-05 - House - House Intrastate Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Economic Development & Business: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-07HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
2020-02-07HouseReported from EDB/IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 257-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2020-02-05HouseThe committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, McDermott.
2020-02-05HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Ichiyama, Quinlan, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Johanson, Matsumoto.
2020-02-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB/IAC on Wednesday, 02-05-20 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to EDB/IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB2433 (Same As) 2020-01-29 - Re-Referred to TEC/CPH, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback