HI HB2596 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - (S) Act 021, 4/14/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 477).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - (S) Act 021, 4/14/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 477).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the statutory ordering of income tax credits, which requires the claiming of refundable credits first, followed by nonrefundable credits.
Title
Income Tax Credits; Ordering of Credit Claims
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | (S) Act 021, 4/14/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 477). | |
2010-04-14 | (H) Act 021, on 4/14/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 232). | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2010-03-31 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 376). | |
2010-03-31 | (S) Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Tokuda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) One Day Notice 03-31-10. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2895) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fukunaga, Hee, Hemmings. | |
2010-03-12 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-10 10:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 132). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Souki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 506-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-12 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-12-10 4:05PM in conference room 308. | |
2010-02-10 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred to Friday, 02-12-10, 4:05 PM. | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-10-10 3:00 PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2749 (Same As) 2010-03-30 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.