HI HB2572 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Medical Cannabis Study Group to examine the complexities surrounding the topic of the legality of medical cannabis. (HB2572 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Medical Use Of Cannabis.
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] |
Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6). |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 533-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-02-08 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-08-18 11:30AM in conference room 329. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-18 at 11:30 AM in room 329. |
2018-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Wednesday, 02-07-18 10:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to HHS, JUD, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2217 (Same As) 2018-01-30 - Re-Referred to CPH/JDC.