HI HB2562 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies the manner in which a member of a board of a planned community association or condominium association may resign. Limits a planned community association board's ability to fill a vacancy. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Common Interest Communities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3659) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 340). |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1018-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Say, Thielen. |
2020-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-28-20 2:01PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-26 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-28-20 at 2:01PM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-26-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-20 at 2:00pm. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-25-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 522-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cachola, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Har. |
2020-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-12-20 2:05PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Subjects
Board of Directors
Common Interest Communities
Condominium Associations
Planned Community Associations
Resignation
Vacancies
Common Interest Communities
Condominium Associations
Planned Community Associations
Resignation
Vacancies