HI HB2561 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the prescription affordability commission within the department of commerce and consumer affairs to review prescription drug costs and establish levels of reimbursement. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Prescription Drug Rate Setting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
2020-02-14HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 655-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2020-02-13HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-02-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-13-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2020-02-06HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Saiki, Yamashita excused (3).
2020-02-06HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 160-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2020-02-04HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
2020-01-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-04-20 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB3045 (Same As) 2020-02-11 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback