HI HB2555 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the specific findings that must be included prior to the public utilities commission making a finding of public convenience or necessary or issuing an authorization. Authorizes an exemption for cargo to be moved on an alternate carrier, if certain conditions are met.
Title
Relating To Water Carriers.
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-09-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3013 (Same As) 2018-01-26 - Referred to CPH/TRE.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2555&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB2555_.HTM |