HI HB2539 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 10:00AM in conference room 016.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 10:00AM in conference room 016.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes insurers, mutual benefit societies, and health maintenance organizations to offer, sell, or renew, on or after January 1, 2017, a high deductible health plan in conjunction with a health savings account to an employer subject to the prepaid health care act together with a prepaid health care plan insurance policy, which is not a high deductible health plan, that has been sold to the employer. Specifies limitations for high deductible health plans and health savings accounts. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
High Deductible Health Plans; Health Savings Accounts; Insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-16 3:15pm in conference room 016. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-16 10:15AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 652). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, McKelvey, Johanson Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; Kidani. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 620) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3580) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-16 1:00PM in conference room 211. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-16 2:00PM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3085) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-16 9:45AM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-16-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 146). |
2016-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 801-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-02-16 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 557-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-02-17 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Belatti, Har, Kawakami, Oshiro; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-17-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Oshiro excused (2). |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 209-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2016-02-08 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Oshiro; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola. |
2016-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Monday, 02-08-16 1:45PM in House conference room 329. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |