HI HB253 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to TRS/CPH, JDC.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits a person from intentionally or knowingly manufacturing, importing, installing, reinstalling, distributing, selling, or offering for sale any counterfeit supplemental restraint system component, nonfunctional airbag, or airbag that does not meet federal safety requirements with the intent that such device replace an airbag in any motor vehicle. Prohibits a person from intentionally or knowingly selling, offering for sale, installing, or reinstalling in a motor vehicle any device that causes the motor vehicle's diagnostic systems to fail to warn that the motor vehicle is equipped with a counterfeit supplemental restraint system component or nonfunctional airbag or that no airbag is installed, as applicable. (HB253 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Motor Vehicles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateReferred to TRS/CPH, JDC.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 358).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
2019-03-01HouseReported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1192) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-21HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey.
2019-02-21HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Thursday, 02-21-19 2:15PM in House conference room 329.
2019-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5).
2019-02-13HouseReported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 371) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD.
2019-02-06HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Matayoshi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to TRN, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB506 (Same As) 2019-02-01 - Re-Referred to CPH/TRS, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback