HI HB2526 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds for the operating budget of the department of human services for fiscal year 2020-2021. Takes effect on December 31, 2059. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Department Of Human Services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2020-05-21SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3622) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2020-03-09SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2020-03-06SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-09-20 3:15PM in conference room 016.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to HMS, WAM.
2020-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 337).
2020-03-03HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-28HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20.
2020-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 969-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-20HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-02-18HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-20 1:00PM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
2020-02-13HouseReported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 388-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-02-07HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Say.
2020-01-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 02-07-20 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB3118 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to HMS, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback