HI HB252 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 235, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1337).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 235, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1337).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a provisional license for speech pathologists. Takes effect on 01/01/2022. (HB252 CD1)
Title
Relating To Speech Pathology.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Act 235, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1337). |
2019-07-09 | House | Act 235, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1337). |
2019-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 42). |
2019-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 42) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Ohno, Takumi, Morikawa, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-19 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Fevella. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 814). |
2019-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Ohno, Takumi Co-Chairs; Morikawa, Ward. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 719). |
2019-04-09 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 667) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1773) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 21). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 872), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno. |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from HLT/IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 431), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, McDermott. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura, Say, Ward. |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/IAC on Tuesday, 02-12-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT/IAC, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB307 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3).