HI HB252 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB252
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to implement the recommendations of the joint fact finding study group's report on pesticide use by large agribusinesses on Kauai. (HB252 HD1)
Title
Relating To Pesticides.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Morikawa, Onishi, Say, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2). |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported from AGR/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 377) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Say, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/EEP on Tuesday, 02-07-17 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to AGR/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB252 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Morikawa, Onishi, Say, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2).