HI HB252 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 1:15PM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires annual reports from the Native Hawaiian Roll Commission. Amends the definition of "qualified Native Hawaiian" to include individuals who meet certain expanded ancestry requirements. Establishes that the Native Hawaiian roll commission is responsible for including in the roll all individuals already registered as Hawaiians or Native Hawaiians through the office of Hawaiian affairs. Repeals directive to amend the Hawaiian Homes Commission Act. Effective July 1, 2050 (part I). Promotes renewable energy in Hawaii by: (1) providing that all penalties, fees, and costs established and collected by the Department of Land and Natural Resources pursuant to Chapter 182, Hawaii Revised Statutes, be deposited in the Special Land and Development Fund; (2) including geothermal resources within the definition of a renewable energy producer; and (3) clarifying the permitting procedures for regulators and renewable energy developers considering geothermal development. Requires the use of an area or site within the conservation district for geothermal resources development to be governed by the board of land and natural resources. Authorizes certain county authorities to issue geothermal resource permits to allow geothermal resources development in an agricultural, rural, or urban district if the development is not considered a permissible use under the applicable county zoning ordinances or general plan. Repeals definition of and deletes references to "reserved lands" in chapter 182, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Effective July 1, 2050 (part II). (SD2).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Native Hawaiians; Recognition; Native Hawaiian Roll Commission; BLNR; Native Hawaiian Traditional and Customary Practice; Mineral Resources; Geothermal Resources

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 1:15PM in conference room 312.
2013-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 2:00PM in conference room 312.
2013-04-22SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 2:00PM in conference room 312.
2013-04-22HouseReceived notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 735).
2013-04-22SenateSenator(s) Ige added as Co-Chair(s).
2013-04-19SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-13 1:30PM in conference room 312.
2013-04-17SenateReceived notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 701).
2013-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697).
2013-04-16SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Galuteria, Chair; Hee, Gabbard, Co-Chair(s); Solomon, Slom.
2013-04-16HouseHouse conferee(s) added: Representative(s) Coffman.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: C. Lee, Hanohano, Rhoads, Luke Co-Chairs; Wooley, Fale.
2013-04-15HouseRe-referred to EEP, OMH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 53
2013-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
2013-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2013-04-11HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 597) in amended form (SD 2).
2013-04-11SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Green). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-04-09Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-13.
2013-04-09SenateFloor amendment No. 13 adopted as amended (SD 2).
2013-04-09SenateFloor Amendment No. 13 offered.
2013-04-09SenateFloor amendment No. 10 adopted as amended (SD 2).
2013-04-09SenateFloor Amendment No. 10 offered.
2013-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13.
2013-04-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2013-04-05SenateReported from THA/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1291) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2013-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on THA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in THA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Hee, Kahele, Kidani, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon, Slom.
2013-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom.
2013-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on THA/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-13 2:50PM in conference room 224.
2013-03-19SenateRe-Referred to THA/JDL.
2013-03-07SenateReferred to THA, JDL.
2013-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 198).
2013-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13.
2013-03-01HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 805) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-02-26HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Ito.
2013-02-25HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-26-13 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2013-02-22HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-13 at 2:00 PM.
2013-02-19HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-22-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2013-02-11HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har, C. Lee, McKelvey, Takai, Thielen excused (6).
2013-02-11HouseReported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 270) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2013-02-06HouseThe committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, Kawakami, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen.
2013-02-04HouseBill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 02-06-13 9:00AM in House conference room 325.
2013-01-22HouseReferred to OMH, JUD, referral sheet 3
2013-01-22HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2013-01-18HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback