HI HB2513 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 9
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 9
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transitions from lump sum deferred deposit transactions to installment-based small dollar loan transactions. Specifies various consumer protection requirements for small dollar loans. Beginning January 1, 2019, requires licensure for small dollar lenders that offer small dollar loans to consumers. Specifies licensing requirements for small dollar lenders.
Title
Relating To Payday Lending.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3008 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 35
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2513&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB2513_.HTM |