HI HB2504 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Belatti, DeCoite, Har, Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Belatti, DeCoite, Har, Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes disclosure and consent requirements for nonparticipating health care providers. Prohibits nonparticipating health care providers from balance billing patients in specific circumstances. Requires the use of dispute solution when a dispute exists as to the reimbursement of a nonparticipating provider. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Health Insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] |
Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Belatti, DeCoite, Har, Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 657-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-13 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Belatti; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-13-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2). |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 203-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2020-02-04 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2020-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-04-20 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2278 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 329.
Subjects
Balance Billing
Dispute Resolution
Health Insurance
Nonparticipating Providers
Prohibitions
Surprise Billing
Dispute Resolution
Health Insurance
Nonparticipating Providers
Prohibitions
Surprise Billing