HI HB2501 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAT with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2).
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAT with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2).
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for paid leave for fully vaccinated employees required to stay home from work or prohibited from returning to work because of COVID-19 exposure who submit to a test within three days of being notified of the exposure and receive negative test results. Effective 7/1/2050. Repeals 6/30/2023. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Pandemic Leave.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAT with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2). |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from PDP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 145-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAT. |
2022-02-03 | House | The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, McKelvey, Mizuno, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Woodson. |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PDP on Thursday, 02-03-22 10:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to PDP, LAT, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |