HI HB2501 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - Act 014, 06/01/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1114).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - Act 014, 06/01/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1114).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the University of Hawaii Community College Promise Program to provide scholarships for the unmet direct cost needs of qualified students enrolled at any community college campus of the University of Hawaii system. Appropriates funds to establish and implement the program. (HB2501 CD1)
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii Community College Promise Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Senate | Act 014, 06/01/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1114). |
2018-06-05 | House | Act 014, on 06/01/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1114). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 163-18). |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 163-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Galuteria, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Cullen, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates. |
2018-04-26 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-27-18 2:30PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Kahele Chair; Galuteria, S. Chang Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Cullen Co-Chairs; Gates, Todd, Matsumoto. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 737) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3587) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Kidani. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3010) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kim, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-18 1:18PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 107). |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 807-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-18 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 622-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Kong, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Quinlan. |
2018-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-13-18 2:10PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |