HI HB25 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB25
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits any person, including a hotel guest, from storing, keeping, carrying, or possessing any firearm or ammunition in any hotel room assigned to a guest with certain exceptions.
Title
Relating To Public Safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to TIA/PVM, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB25 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to TIA/PVM, JUD, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=25&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB25_.HTM |