HI HB2495 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - The committee(s) on EEP/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - The committee(s) on EEP/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that whenever the infrastructure or equipment for electric utility service is required to be installed underground for affordable housing within an area that has been designated by a county as a transit-oriented development area, it shall be the responsibility of the electric utility company to install the infrastructure or equipment.
Title
Relating To Affordable Housing.
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] |
Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on EEP/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/HSG on Tuesday, 02-04-20 9:45AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP/HSG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2964 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to HOU/EET/PSM, WAM/CPH.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2495&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2495_.HTM |