HI HB2494 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-22 - Act 010, 04/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1110).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-22 - Act 010, 04/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1110).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes DOE employees to volunteer to administer or assist a student with blood glucose monitoring.
Title
Blood Glucose Monitoring; Students; Diabetes
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | Senate | Act 010, 04/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1110). |
2016-04-21 | House | Act 010, on 04/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1110). |
2016-04-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-04-05 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 397). |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-16. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3284) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 03-30-16 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPH. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2976) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPH. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, K.Kahele, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-18-16 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-16 1:25PM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to EDU, CPH. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 47). |
2016-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kong, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-03 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 697-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-25 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Nakashima. |
2016-02-24 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-25-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-16 | House | Re-referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 16 |
2016-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2016-02-12 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 238-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN. |
2016-02-10 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Oshiro. |
2016-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-10-16 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to HLT, EDN, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2975 (Same As) 2016-03-08 - Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 25
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2494&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2494_.HTM |