HI HB2492 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Quinlan voting no (2) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Quinlan voting no (2) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes unlawful shipment of tobacco products to anyone other than a licensee. Includes e-liquid within the definition of "tobacco products", as used in the cigarette tax and tobacco tax law, thereby making all provisions of the cigarette tax and tobacco tax law that relate to tobacco products applicable to e-liquid as well. Increases the license fee for wholesalers or dealers and the retail tobacco permit fee. (HB2492 HD1)
Title
Relating To Chapter 245, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Quinlan voting no (2) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 548-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, Tokioka. |
2018-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-13-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2). |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 177-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-02-02 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Friday, 02-02-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |