HI HB2490 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Act 201, 7/2/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1311).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Act 201, 7/2/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1311).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enhances the juvenile justice system by concentrating secure bed space on serious juvenile offenders. Strengthens disposition, adjustment, diversion, and services available for juvenile offenders to ensure family court judges, court staff, departmental staff, and service providers have the tools needed to keep youth safely and effectively in their communities. Increases interagency collaboration. Establishes a temporary Juvenile Justice Oversight Advisory Council. Makes an appropriation. (HB2490 CD2)
Title
Juvenile Justice; Juvenile Probation; Juvenile Justice Oversight Advisory Council; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | Senate | Act 201, 7/2/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1311). |
2014-07-08 | House | Act 201, on 7/2/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1311). |
2014-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 753). |
2014-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 723). |
2014-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 2). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen. |
2014-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 05-01-14. |
2014-04-29 | House | Floor amendment adopted by voice vote as amended in CD 2 with none voting no and Representative(s) Hashem, Ito excused. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 05-01-14. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Report filed. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Separated Committee Report. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (CD 2). |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 9 offered. |
2014-04-29 | House | Floor Amendment No. 8 offered by Rep. Luke. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 115-14). |
2014-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-29-14. |
2014-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 115-14) as amended in (CD 1). |
2014-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Hee, Ige; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Slom. |
2014-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Creagan, Ing; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Awana, Thielen. |
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 12:50PM in Conference Room 229. |
2014-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-24-14 4:00PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-23-14 4:30PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-15 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Changed: Senator Chun Oakland discharged as Member; Added as Chair. Senator Espero discharged as Chair; Added as Co-Chair. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 675). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Espero Chair; Hee, Ige Co-Chairs; Chun Oakland, Slom Members. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Carroll, Creagan, Ing Co-Chairs; Awana, Thielen Members. |
2014-04-14 | House | Re-referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 55 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 652) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3394) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-02-14 9:20AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Reported from PSM/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3018) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Galuteria, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Ihara. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Green. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-14 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 360). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 889-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2014-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (3). |
2014-02-14 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 464-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-02-06 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2014-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-06-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-31 | House | Re-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 12 |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |