HI HB2485 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the board of trustees of the employees' retirement system to conduct a study to determine and provide retirement benefits for Hawaii national guard members who are activated under state active duty orders, and submit findings and recommendations to the legislature prior to the regular session of 2022. Appropriates funds. Takes effect on 1/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Hawaii National Guard Retirement Benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 3:10PM in conference room 224. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to LCA/PSM, WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 239). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 817-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Nakamura, Nishimoto. |
2020-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-19-20 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 575-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-13 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-13-20 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2020-02-10 | House | Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 25 |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB/PVM, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |