HI HB2481 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the maximum civil fine for littering on a public highway from $500 to $1,000. Increases the maximum civil penalty for violations of litter control from $500 to $1,000. Increases the criminal fine for the offense of criminal littering from $1,000 to $5,000.
Title
Relating To Littering.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-13-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Thursday, 02-13-20 at 2:00pm. |
2020-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-12-20 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2481&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2481_.HTM |