HI HB2473 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the construction and use of micro housing units on Hawaiian home lands managed by DHHL, notwithstanding zoning laws, permit provisions, and building codes. Makes an appropriation to DHHL for construction of micro housing units, subject to certain conditions, and to build general organizational capacity of native Hawaiian-controlled nonprofit housing developers. (HB2473 HD1)
Title
Relating To Housing For Native Hawaiians.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from HSG/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 590-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, DeCoite, Creagan, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Hashem, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, McDermott. |
2018-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/OMH on Tuesday, 02-13-18 10:10AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to HSG/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2424 (Same As) 2018-04-26 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 682).