HI HB2471 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 22 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-22 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 22 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-22 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "Adequate Reserve Fund" to exclude the benefit cost rate from June 2020 through August 2021, for calendar years 2023 through 2030. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Adequate Reserve Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 767). |
2022-04-22 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Marten, Ohno, Tokioka excused (4). |
2022-04-22 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 746). |
2022-04-21 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-22. |
2022-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 879). |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715). |
2022-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 859) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3867) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | The committee on WAM will reconsider its previous decision on 04-01-22 and will hold a public decision making on 04-05-22 10:36AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Misalucha. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-22 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3388) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 93). |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 763-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2). |
2022-02-18 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 601-22), recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-02-16 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-16-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 64-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2022-02-03 | House | The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Quinlan, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Thursday, 02-03-22 9:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3128 (Same As) 2022-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).