HI HB2467 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Nakamura, Nishimoto.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Hawaii tourism authority to collaborate with the department of accounting and general services to identify an appropriate location for and open a tourism information booth or center in the state capital district to promote tourism and tourist destinations in the capital district. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2099. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Tourism.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Legislative Management: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Tourism & International Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Nakamura, Nishimoto.
2020-02-14HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-19-20 4:00PM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-14HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
2020-02-14HouseReported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 496-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2020-02-11HouseThe committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Cullen, Nakashima, Morikawa, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
2020-02-07HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Tuesday, 02-11-20 2:00PM in House conference room 312.
2020-02-07HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
2020-02-07HouseReported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 180-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LMG.
2020-02-04HouseThe committees on TIA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Holt, DeCoite, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Creagan.
2020-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TIA on Tuesday, 02-04-20 9:05AM in House conference room 312.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to TIA, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-22HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback