HI HB2457 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the Department of Education from mandating that any student attend a school outside the student's service area. Establishes a five-year phaseout period. Requires the Department of Education to submit annual progress reports.
Title
Relating To Student Out-of-service-area Attendance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-10-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2451 (Same As) 2022-01-24 - Referred to EDU, JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2457&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB2457_.HTM |