HI HB2452 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Referred to GVO/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the design of all state buildings constructed on or after July 1, 2018, to include a shelter room or area that is capable of protecting individuals from Category 3 hurricanes. (HB2452 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Public Safety.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01SenateReferred to GVO/PSM, WAM.
2018-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 40).
2018-02-21HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Choy, Holt, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2018-02-21HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 795-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2018-02-16HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Fukumoto, Gates, Keohokalole, Lowen, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Holt; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kobayashi; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakamura.
2018-02-14HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-16-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2018-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
2018-02-13HouseReported from PBS/VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 314-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2018-02-08HouseThe committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) LoPresti, Fukumoto, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and Excused: none.
2018-02-08HouseThe committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Creagan, DeCoite, Say, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing.
2018-02-05HouseBill scheduled to be heard by PBS/VMI on Thursday, 02-08-18 9:05AM in House conference room 312.
2018-01-29HouseReferred to PBS/VMI, FIN, referral sheet 9
2018-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2018-01-23HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback