HI HB2449 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to establish staff positions in the Hawaii state archives. Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds to finance the construction of an additional building for state archives. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii State Archives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3386) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to LCA/GVO, WAM. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 91). |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) B. Kobayashi, Takayama voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 709-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-17 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 509-22), recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-02-14 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2022-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-14-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-11-22 2:15PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 73-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-02-02 | House | The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Tam, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 02-02-22 10:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to CAI, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Capital Improvement Project
Records Inventory
Staff Positions
State Archives
Transfer Plan
Capital Improvement Project
Records Inventory
Staff Positions
State Archives
Transfer Plan