HI HB2424 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the allowable loan term for direct loans provided by DHHL to be forty years, instead of thirty years, as currently outlined in section 215 of the Hawaiian Homes Commission Act, 1920, as amended.
Title
Relating To The Hawaiian Homes Commission Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3113 (Same As) 2024-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2424&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2424_.HTM |