HI HB2411 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 682).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 682).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the definition of growler. Permits a class 18 small craft producer pub licensee to manufacture not more than one hundred twenty-five thousand barrels of malt beverages on the licensee's premises during the license year. Clarifies that a class 14 brewpub licensee or class 18 small craft producer pub licensee may conduct certain activities at satellite locations other than the licensee's primary manufacturing premises under certain conditions. Allows direct shipment of all forms of liquor, rather than just wine, by certain licensees. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Intoxicating Liquor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 682). |
2018-04-26 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 11:15AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-18 11:15AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-24 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 831). |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Espero, Nishihara. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Evans, Takumi, Cullen Co-Chairs; Yamashita, McDermott. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 726) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3512) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Nishihara. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 04-03-18 9:35AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 101). |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 869-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola. |
2018-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6). |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 501-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-09 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Johanson, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Yamane, McDermott. |
2018-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-09-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Souki excused (3). |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 78-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-02-02 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 02-02-18 8:45AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to EDB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2711 (Same As) 2018-03-23 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Subjects
Brewpubs
Containers
Direct Shipping
Intoxicating Liquors
Liquor Licenses
Manufacturers
Retail Sales
Satellite Locations
Small Craft Producer Pubs
Containers
Direct Shipping
Intoxicating Liquors
Liquor Licenses
Manufacturers
Retail Sales
Satellite Locations
Small Craft Producer Pubs