HI HB2408 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Improves the State's preparedness and response to disasters. Requires statewide inventories of hospitals, dialysis centers, and medical facilities; satellite phones; and generators to provide backup power. Appropriates funds for positions related to emergency response planning and allocation of resources and for non-perishable food in natural disasters.
Title
Relating To Emergency Management.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3072 (Same As) 2020-05-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2408&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2408_.HTM |