HI HB2407 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires DOH to adopt rules to establish a classification system for composting facilities or operations for the purposes of regulating them for health purposes. Allows composting and co-composting in the agricultural district, including on lands with class A or B soils. Appropriates moneys to the Department of Health for a Program Specialist position in the Solid and Hazardous Waste Branch. Effective 7/1/2020. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Statewide Composting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
2020-05-12SenateReported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3440) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
2020-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Fevella.
2020-03-09SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-20 2:45PM in conference room 224.
2020-03-06SenateRe-Referred to AEN, JDC/WAM.
2020-03-03SenateReferred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM.
2020-03-03SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-03-03SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 225).
2020-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har, Kong, Say, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 935-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-26HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Nishimoto.
2020-02-24HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-26-20 12:00PM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
2020-02-14HouseReported from EEP/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 555-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-02-11HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
2020-02-11HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane.
2020-02-05HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP/HLT on Tuesday, 02-11-20 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2020-01-31HouseRe-referred to EEP/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 10
2020-01-27HouseReferred to EEP/HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB3121 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - Re-Referred to AEN, JDC/WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback