HI HB2406 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes the state earned income tax credit refundable and permanent. Allows nonrefundable state earned income tax credits claimed for certain taxable years that exceeded tax liability for the original claim year to be credited against net tax liability in subsequent years until exhausted, up to the end of the 2022 tax year.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 353-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-09 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Sayama, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi, Okimoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-09-22 10:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |